**Multiplication** is important and difficult while doing simplifications. I have provided 30 multiplication tricks. **Multiplication tricks** are helpful for easy calculations and to save time. I recommend you to learn **multiplication table** up to 20. If it is not possible, you should learn up to the 9th table.

To speed up your calculations play **multiplication games**. Many Android applications are providing games for calculation practice. Try android apps like elevate. If you play games on the elevate app, **multiplication practice** is also done. I have provided **multiplication chats** below that you need to remember.

**Note: **Click on show/hide button to show index of the content.

1. Multiplication of Single Digit Numbers

2. Multiplication of Two-Digit Numbers

3. Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers

4. Multiplication of Four-Digit Numbers

5. Distribution Method

6. Giving and Taking Method

7. Multiplication of the Same Number

8. Multiplication of any Number between 12 and 19

9. Multiplication of 11

10. Multiplication of 111

11. Multiplication of 1111

12. Multiplication of 5

13. Multiplication of 50

14. Multiplication of 500

15. Ending with 5 and Difference 10

16. Ending with 5 and Same Number

17. Multiplication Near Value 50

18. Multiplication of the Same Number Near the Value of 100, 200, 300,400

19. Multiplication of 37 with 3 Tables

20. Common Digit Number is Greater than the Normal Number

21. Checksum Method for Verification

22. Increasing 3’s Multiplication Method

23. Increasing 6’s Multiplication Method

24. Increasing 9’s Multiplication Method

25. Sequential Inputs of Numbers with 9 (1’S)

26. Sequential Inputs of Numbers with 9 (8’S)

27. Multiplication Series of Numbers Without 8

28. Numerical Palindrome with 1’s

29. Multiply two digits numbers ending in 1

30. Common Sense Method for Multiplication

BODAMAS Rules

### 1. Multiplication of Single Digit Numbers:

I know no need to explain about single digit number multiplication. You all well-known method is **single digit multiplication**. Just I want to tell you simple trick for **fast calculations**.

I would like give you an example with explanation. Let’s see,

4×6 takes some time that is more than 6×4. So try to do multiplication with **large numbers**. If you know multiplication well, you can do any format. This trick is only for fast calculations and beginners.

No need to explain anything about single-digit multiplication. I have given three examples to understand.

**E.g.** 6×4=24

**E.g.** 7×2=14

**E.g.** 9×7=63

### 2. Multiplication of Two-Digit Numbers:

Multiplication of two-digit number is a really good trick for time-saving. Most of the time **two digit multiplication** is required, so you should learn. Two digit multiplications are basic for three and four digit multiplication.

The normal method we do is three lines. Here you can do with the **single line**. Let’s see,

**E.g.**

26×32

=26×32

∴832

#### Steps to Solve Two Digit Multiplication:

**Step1:** Multiply unit digits of two numbers, i.e.6×2=12. 1 forward carries. **[2]**

**Step2:** Multiply cross of two digits and add, i.e. 2×2+6×3=22. Then add carry to 22 (from step1, i.e. 23. 2 is a carry of 23 number (from step 2). **[32]**

**Step3:** Multiply ten digit of the numbers, i.e. 2×3=6. Then add carry from previous step i.e. 6+2=8. The final value of this multiplication is **[832]**.

### 3. Multiplication of Three Digit Numbers:

**Multiplication of three digit number** is some advanced method compared to two digit multiplication. It is a similar method of two digit multiplication. The only difference is, **we are adding only one more step extra compared to two digit multiplication**.

Normal three digit multiplication is usually taking more time. So you should learn multiplication of three-digit method to speed up your calculations. Let’s see example and steps to do.

**E.g.**

242×364

∴88088

#### Steps to Solve Three Digit Multiplication:

### 4. Multiplication of Four-Digit Numbers:

**Multiplication of four digit number** is an advanced method. It is not so easy. This method requires some practice for accurate values. The little bit of concentration is required to do four-digit multiplication. You can do four-digit multiplications in 7 simple steps.

So please practice as much as possible and **remember steps**. Practice is required, by seeing you will not get accurate values for some time. You will confuse without practice. Let’s see,

**E.g.**

3214×1298

∴4171772

#### Steps to Solve Four Digit Multiplication:

### 5. Distribution Method:

The distribution method is an advanced time-saving method. If you want to go blindly, you can do **two-step multiplication trick**. I recommend you to learn this trick and practice. Pen and paper not required for **distribution method** calculations. It sounds good right. Practice is required for faster calculations.

**E.g.**

12×17

=(12×10)+ (12×7)

=120+84

∴204

### 6. Giving and Taking Method:

**Giving and taking method** is also advanced time-saving method. If you don’t want to learn so many tricks, simply do two-digit multiplication of above trick.

I agree sometimes too many tricks makes you confuse without enough practice. If you are able to practice, learn all tricks of this post. All **tricks are recommended**.

This trick works when the **value is nearer** to 10, 20, 30, 40, 50 etc. that means unit digit is must be zero. If it is less than 50, take negative of that value. If it is more than 50, take positive of that value.

**E.g.**

12×47

=12×(50-3)

=12×50-12×3

=600-36

∴564

**E.g.**

56×99

=56×(100-1)

=5600-56

∴5544

### 7. Multiplication of the Same Number:

**Multiplication of the same number** is square of a number. This trick not required to learn. Now I am telling you for understanding purpose only. Sometimes it is also time-saving method.

Learn every method and trick, but I suggest you, practice well. If don’t want to do practice, simply go with **usual methods**. You don’t know where to use tricks without practice.

It looks usual method.

**E.g.**

36^{2}=0936+0360

∴1296

#### Steps to solve Multiplication of same number

### 8. Multiplication of any Number between 12 and 19:

**Multiplication of any number is between 12 and 19 method**. You can also call (include 12) teen method for multiplication. This method of multiplication is applicable to numbers between 12 and 19.

Apply this trick, when your calculation of numbers between 12 and 19.

**E.g.**

14×17

**Step1:** Multiply unit digit of two numbers. 4×7=28 (2 carry). [8]

**Step2:** Add 14 and another number unit number i.e. 14+7=21. then add 21 and previous step carry i.e 21+2=23. [238]

### 9. Multiplication of 11:

**Multiplication of 11** with any number is easy. It is an easy and time-saving method. It is basic for three and four digit method. You should learn this to understand three and four digit 11 multiplication.

**E.g.**

11×345

∴3795

**Step1:** First digit is take as it is 5. [5]

**Step2:** It is two digit 1's. So add two digits every time. Add 4+5=9.{95]

**Step3:** Add next two digits 3+4=7. [795]

**Step4:** Take last digit as it is 3. [3795]

### 10. Multiplication of 111:

Multiplication of 111 is the advanced method. It is similar to 11 multiplication i.e. previous method.

**E.g.**

111×873

∴96903

### 11. Multiplication of 1111:

**Multiplication of 1111** is an advanced method for larger numbers. It is also similar to above two methods.

**E.g.**

1111×5365

∴5960515

### 12. Multiplication of 5:

Multiplication of **5 method is easy**. It is helpful to larger numbers. This method is basic for next level of methods. *Multiplication* for larger numbers takes more time. This method is helpful to save your time.

You can answer within 2 seconds for any number that may be larger number.

**E.g.**

428×5

=428/2×10

∴2140

### 13. Multiplication of 50:

It is similar to the above method. Just we are adding as a unit digit zero to 5. Multiplication of 50 means it is a **larger number** compared to 5 right.

**E.g.**

18×50

=18/2×100

∴900

### 14. Multiplication of 500:

It is similar to above two methods. I have increased one more zero for understanding purpose. 500 means it is larger number compared to above two methods. That above two methods I have explained for this method.

**E.g.**

21×500

=21/2×1000

∴10500

### 15. Ending with 5 and Difference 10:

Ending with 5 and difference is 10. This **method is tricky**. You need to check before applying this method, conditions of the method are satisfied or not.

**E.g.**

45×35

=(4+1)×3=15

∴1575

### 16. Ending with 5 and Same Number:

Ending with 5 and the same number is similar to above method but not 100%. The similarity is ending **unit digit number is 5**. This method is also somewhat tricky. Check all the conditions are satisfied or not before applying this method.

**E.g.**

25×25

=(2+1)×2=6

∴625

### 17. Multiplication Near Value 50:

Multiplication of number i.e. **near the value of 50**. It is a completely different method of above I mentioned. It is simple mathematics.

47 is near the value of 50, if you can add 3 to 47, then it is 50. So subtract 3 from 47 and add it to 47. Then your multiplication looks like 44×50. Now multiplication is easy right.

**E.g.**

(47)^{2}

=47×47

=44×50

=2200

// 3^{2}=9

∴2200+9=2209

### 18. Multiplication of the Same Number Near the Value of 100, 200, 300,400….

Multiplication of the same number, that is near value of 100, 200, 300 etc. It is a similar method of above but **little complicated**. If you can practice it is also easy.

Let’s see one example, I am taking 86 square. It is near the value of 100. 86 value is 14 less compared to 100. Then take 14 value as minus sign and multiply (14×14). I will tell you with **simplified steps**.

**E.g.**

86

86 | -14

86 | -14

72 | 196 (1 is carry)

7396

### 19. Multiplication of 37 with 3 Tables:

Multiplication of 37 with 3 tables is an **advance time-saving method**. This means 37 and any number multiplied by 3, multiplication method. This method works only product of 3. It is very easy.

**E.g.**

37×3

=7×3=21 {Multiply unit digits]
∴Take last digit i.e. 111

**E.g.**

37×9

=7×9=63 [Multiply unit digits]

∴Take last digit i.e. 333

**E.g.**

37×21

=7×21 [Multiply unit digits]

=147

∴Take last digit 777

### 20. Common Digit Number is Greater than the Normal Number:

Common digit number is **greater than the normal number** method saves time a lot. It works only one number is same digits and that is larger than other. See below example number

It looks big but you can answer within 2 seconds.

Don't you believe? Let’s see,

**E.g.**

5732×9999

=5732<9999

∴57314268

### 21. Checksum Method for Verification:

**Checksum method** is useful for all multiplications. Learn how to do and how does it works. Above I did *multiplication* for the larger number. That may right or wrong. Checksum method is used for **verification** of multiplication. We got 5732×9999=57314268 (previous method).

Add every digits of numbers each side that separating multiplication symbol. If no multiplication symbol, you can add all digits.

**E.g.**

5732×9999

=17×36

=8×9

=72

=7+2

∴9 Satisfied

### 22. Increasing 3’s Multiplication Method:

**Increasing 3’s** multiplication method is easy and no need to do any calculation. You have to remember this numbers with some logic that I will tell you.

Square of first (3) value is 09. Just analyze how it is increasing.

**E.g.**

3=09

33=1089

333=110889

3333=11108889

### 23. Increasing 6’s Multiplication Method:

**Increasing 6’s multiplication** method is similar to above. You have to remember values with some logic. No need to do any calculations for this method.

**E.g.**

6=36

66=4356

666=443556

6666=44435556

### 24. Increasing 9’s Multiplication Method:

**Increasing 9’s multiplication method** is also similar to above two methods. Just remember values of below what I mentioned. Please understand and follow the logic for larger numbers.

**E.g.**

9=81

99=9801

999=998001

9999=99980001

999999999×999999999=999999980000001

### 25. Sequential Inputs of Numbers with 9 (1’S):

Sequential inputs of numbers with 9. Here increasing numerical digits of units, tens and adding numbers also increasing. Finally, you will get result output is same for all that is 1’s. You need to remember **no need any calculations**.

**E.g.**

1×9+2=11

12×9+3=111

123×9+4=1111

1234×9+5=11111

12345×9+6=111111

123456×9+7=1111111

1234567×9+8=11111111

12345678×9+9=111111111

123456789+10=1111111111

### 26. Sequential Inputs of Numbers with 9 (8’S):

Sequential inputs of numbers with 9. It is similar to the above method. Above method, sequential inputs are ascending order (1234). Here sequential inputs are **descending order** (987).

No need to do any calculation, you have to remember.

**E.g.**

9×9+7=88

98×9+6=888

987×9+5=8888

9876×9+4=88888

98765×9+3=888888

987654×9+2=8888888

9876543×9+1=88888888

98765432×9+0=888888888

### 27. Multiplication Series of Numbers Without 8:

Multiplication series of **numbers without 8**. Here we are taking without 8 number series and multiplying by 9th table numbers. Finally, you will get values of 1’s, 2’s, 3’s, 4’s …etc

**E.g.**

12345679×9=111111111

12345679×18=222222222

12345679×27=333333333

12345679×36=444444444

12345679×45=555555555

12345679×54=666666666

12345679×63=777777777

12345679×72=888888888

12345679×81=999999999

### 28. Numerical Palindrome with 1’s:

**Numerical palindrome** with 1’s method is easy that i motioned above multiplication method of 1's. I am hoping you know about palindrome. Here I am not explaining anything about palindrome.

See values, it looks like a palindrome. No need any calculation **simply remember**.

**E.g.**

1×1=1

11×11=121

111×111=12321

1111×1111=1234321

11111×11111=123454321

111111×111111=12345654321

1111111×1111111=1234567654321

11111111×11111111=123456787654321

111111111×111111111=12345678987654321

### 29. Multiply two digits numbers ending in 1

Multiplication of **two digit numbers** i.e. ending unit digit number is 1. Two numbers unit digit should be one. Then you can apply this method. This method is new to me also. Let’s see

**E.g.**

51×31=1581

Step 1: Unit digit keep as it is 1. [1]

Step 2: Add the left digits 5+3=8. [81]

Step 3: Multiply the left digits i.e. 5×3=15. [1581]

### 30. Common Sense Method for Multiplication:

**Common sense method** is for multiplication in aptitude numerical simplification. I gave this method name for understanding purpose only. Please use common sense and choose what method is required.

I know difficult to **solve without practice**. If you practice well, It is very easy. It is ultimate method for *multiplication*. You should know all methods of multiplication to apply this method.

I will give an example, think how you can solve? You should apply more than one method to solve this example. Let’s see,

**E.g.**

33×333×3333

3×11×333×3333

11×333×9999

3663×9999

36626337

If you found **any errors**, Please comment. Please share this article for others. For more updates like face-book page.